3i Infrastructure PLC Directorate Change (6869G)
20 Juli 2023 - 1:29PM
UK Regulatory
TIDM3IN
RNS Number : 6869G
3i Infrastructure PLC
20 July 2023
3i Infrastructure plc (the "Company")
Directorate changes
Paul Masterton and Ian Lobley
The Company announces that Paul Masterton and Ian Lobley have
retired from the Board with effect from 20 July 2023. Stephanie
Hazell will succeed Paul Masterton as the Senior Independent
Director ('SID').
Jenny Dunstan
The Company announces that pursuant to the relationship
agreement dated 15 October 2018 between 3i Group plc ('3i') and the
Company, 3i has nominated Jennifer Dunstan as a non-executive
Director of the Company to replace Ian Lobley. The Board has
approved the appointment of Jennifer Dunstan as a non-executive
Director with effect from 20 July 2023.
Jennifer joined 3i in 2005 as an investor (then Partner) in the
UK Buyouts team and Head of Consumer in the UK. In 2009 she moved
to head up the Fund Investor Relations team. Prior to joining 3i,
Jennifer spent nine years at Terra Firma Capital Partners and
Nomura's Principal Finance Group (PFG), where she was Managing
Director. Jennifer started her career as a solicitor for Allen,
Allen & Hemsley in Sydney and London. She is co-founder,
non-executive Director and past Chair of Level 20, an initiative to
support women in private equity, and also a current Trustee of The
Fred Hollows Foundation (UK).
Martin Magee
Additionally, the Company announces the appointment of Martin
Magee as a non-executive Director with effect from 20 July
2023.
Martin has served as the Finance Director and Executive Director
of Jersey Electricity plc since 2002. Before Jersey Electricity,
Martin spent nine years at Scottish Power plc in a variety of
senior finance roles. He previously worked with Stakis plc (now
part of the Hilton Hotels Group) for nine years. Martin is a
non-executive Director and Audit Chair of Jersey Post International
Ltd and until May 2021 was non-executive Chair of Aberdeen Standard
Capital Offshore Strategy Fund Limited. He is a current member of
the Institute of Chartered Accountants of Scotland having qualified
in 1984. Martin is Jersey resident.
Richard Laing, Chair of 3i Infrastructure plc, said:
"We are extremely grateful to Paul and Ian for their significant
and invaluable contributions as Directors, and in Paul's case as
SID, and wish them well for the future. We are delighted that
Jennifer and Martin have agreed to join the Board. They bring with
them a broad range of expertise and experience across a range of
sectors."
The Company confirms that the Jersey Financial Services
Commission have issued confirmations of no objection in relation to
both Jennifer Dunstan and Martin Magee's appointments.
There are no further matters to be disclosed in relation to
Jennifer Dunstan or Martin Magee in accordance with paragraph
9.6.13R of the UKLA's Listing Rules.
This information is provided by RNS, the news service of the
London Stock Exchange. RNS is approved by the Financial Conduct
Authority to act as a Primary Information Provider in the United
Kingdom. Terms and conditions relating to the use and distribution
of this information may apply. For further information, please
contact rns@lseg.com or visit www.rns.com.
RNS may use your IP address to confirm compliance with the terms
and conditions, to analyse how you engage with the information
contained in this communication, and to share such analysis on an
anonymised basis with others as part of our commercial services.
For further information about how RNS and the London Stock Exchange
use the personal data you provide us, please see our Privacy
Policy.
END
BOAFBLFLXDLLBBV
(END) Dow Jones Newswires
July 20, 2023 07:29 ET (11:29 GMT)
3i Infrastructure (LSE:3IN)
Historical Stock Chart
Von Aug 2024 bis Sep 2024
3i Infrastructure (LSE:3IN)
Historical Stock Chart
Von Sep 2023 bis Sep 2024